OR SB5527 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, July 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, July 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limits certain biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by State Parks and Recreation Department. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to State Parks and Recreation Department for biennial expenses.] Limits certain biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by State Parks and Recreation Department. Limits biennial expenditures by department from lottery moneys for certain purposes. Limits biennial expenditures by department from federal funds for certain purposes. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the State Parks and Recreation Department; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Effective date, July 1, 2019. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Chapter 302, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-29 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith DB. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Post, Reschke; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Barreto, Wilson. |
2019-05-28 | House | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Hayden, Nearman. |
2019-05-28 | House | Carried over to May 29, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-27 | House | Carried over to May 28, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-23 | House | Carried over to May 27, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-22 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-17 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-05-17 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 5--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |