OR SB5527 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-17 - Effective date, July 15, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-17 - Effective date, July 15, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Approves certain new or increased fees adopted by Oregon Health Authority. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2015.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Oregon Health Authority; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-07-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-17 | Senate | Effective date, July 15, 2015. |
2015-07-17 | Senate | Chapter 695, 2015 Laws. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-07-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed.Ayes, 44; Nays, 16--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Davis, Esquivel, Evans, Gilliam, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Johnson, Krieger, McLane, Post, Sprenger, Weidner. |
2015-07-01 | House | Second reading. |
2015-07-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-06-30 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-06-30 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Bates. Passed.Ayes, 21; nays, 6--Ferrioli, Girod, Knopp, Kruse, Thatcher, Thomsen; excused, 3--Boquist, Burdick, Olsen. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |