OR SB5526 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Approves certain new or increased fees adopted by Occupational Therapy Licensing Board. Approves certain new or increased fees adopted by Occupational Therapy Licensing Board. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Occupational Therapy Licensing Board; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB5526 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB5526/Introduced |