OR SB5526 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - Effective date, July 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - Effective date, July 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Human Services for certain biennial expenses. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts and certain federal funds, but excluding lottery funds and other federal funds, collected or received by department for certain purposes. Limits biennial expenditures by department from certain federal funds. Authorizes specified nonlimited expenditures. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Emergency Board for allocations to department for foster parent supports. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Department of Human Services; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-07-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-07-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-24 | Senate | Effective date, July 19, 2017. |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Chapter 597, 2017 Laws. |
2017-07-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-06 | House | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Rayfield, Smith DB. |
2017-07-06 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Rayfield. Passed.Ayes, 36; Nays, 22--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Vial, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 2--Boone, Heard. |
2017-07-06 | House | Second reading. |
2017-07-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-07-05 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-07-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed.Ayes, 22; nays, 6--Boquist, Ferrioli, Knopp, Kruse, Linthicum, Thatcher; excused, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Olsen. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-07-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |