OR SB5525 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Effective date, August 9, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Oregon Health Authority for certain biennial expenses. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, tobacco and marijuana tax receipts and certain federal funds, but excluding lottery funds and other federal funds, collected or received by authority for certain purposes. Limits biennial expenditures by authority from certain lottery moneys for certain purposes. Limits biennial expenditures by authority from certain federal funds for certain purposes. Authorizes specified nonlimited expenditures. Limits biennial expenditures from Public Employees' Revolving Fund and Oregon Educators Revolving Fund for benefit plan premiums and self-insurance. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the financial administration of the Oregon Health Authority; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2019-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-14SenateEffective date, August 9, 2019.
2019-08-14SenateChapter 695, 2019 Laws.
2019-08-09SenateGovernor signed.
2019-07-03HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-07-03SenatePresident signed.
2019-06-29HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 41; Nays, 10--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Lewis, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Wilson; Excused, 7--Clem, Greenlick, Hernandez, McKeown, Noble, Smith DB, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Evans.
2019-06-29HouseRules suspended. Second reading.
2019-06-29HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2019-06-29HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2019-06-29HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-06-29SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 2--Thatcher, Thomsen; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist.
2019-06-29SenateSecond reading.
2019-06-21SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2019-06-20SenateWork Session held.
2019-06-13SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2019-06-13SenateWork Session held.
2019-06-12SenateWork Session scheduled.
2019-03-28SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-27SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-26SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-25SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-25SenatePublic Hearing Cancelled.
2019-03-21SenatePublic Hearing Cancelled.
2019-03-20SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-19SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-14SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-12SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-11SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-07SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-06SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-05SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-23SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
2019-01-15SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2019-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback