OR SB5524 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - Effective date, July 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - Effective date, July 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Higher Education Coordinating Commission for biennial expenses. Limits biennial expenditures by commission from lottery moneys for debt service on lottery bonds. Limits biennial expenditures by commission from lottery moneys allocated from Education Stability Fund for Oregon Opportunity Grants. Limits biennial expenditures by commission from lottery moneys for Outdoor School Education Fund. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by commission for certain purposes. Limits biennial expenditures of commission from federal funds for certain purposes. Limits biennial expenditures of commission from bond proceeds and other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by commission for grant to Linn-Benton Community College. Limits biennial expenditures by commission from lottery moneys allocated from Sports Lottery Account for public universities. Limits biennial expenditures by commission from timber tax funds for Community College Support Fund. Authorizes specified nonlimited expenditures. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Higher Education Coordinating Commission; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-07-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-07-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-24 | Senate | Effective date, July 19, 2017. |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Chapter 595, 2017 Laws. |
2017-07-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-06 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Sollman. |
2017-07-06 | House | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Sollman, Wilson. |
2017-07-06 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Smith Warner. Passed.Ayes, 37; Nays, 21--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Bynum, Esquivel, Hack, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Lewis, McLane, Meek, Nearman, Noble, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Wilson; Excused, 2--Boone, Heard. |
2017-07-06 | House | Second reading. |
2017-07-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-07-05 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-07-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 24; nays, 4--Boquist, Ferrioli, Linthicum, Thatcher; excused, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Olsen. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-07-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing Cancelled. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |