OR SB5520 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Effective date, July 1, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts and reimbursements from federal service agreements, but excluding lottery funds and other federal funds, collected or received by Oregon Government Ethics Commission. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the financial administration of the Oregon Government Ethics Commission; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-24SenateEffective date, July 1, 2017.
2017-05-24SenateChapter 116, 2017 Laws.
2017-05-18SenateGovernor signed.
2017-05-12HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-05-10SenatePresident signed.
2017-05-09HouseThird reading. Carried by Smith G. Passed.Ayes, 43; Nays, 15--Barreto, Esquivel, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Lewis, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Wilson; Excused, 2--Gorsek, McLane.
2017-05-08HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 9, 2017 Calendar.
2017-05-04HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 8, 2017 Calendar.
2017-05-03HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 4, 2017 Calendar.
2017-05-02HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 3, 2017 Calendar.
2017-05-01HouseSecond reading.
2017-04-28HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2017-04-24HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2017-04-20HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2017-04-19SenateThird reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr.
2017-04-18SenateSecond reading.
2017-04-17SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2017-04-14SenateWork Session held.
2017-04-06SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2017-04-06SenateWork Session held.
2017-02-23SenatePublic Hearing held.
2017-01-24SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On General Government.
2017-01-17SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2017-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback