OR SB5519 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-24 - Effective date, July 19, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-24 - Effective date, July 19, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Education for State School Fund.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-24 | Senate | Effective date, July 19, 2013. |
2013-07-24 | Senate | Chapter 638, 2013 Laws. |
2013-07-22 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-07-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-01 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Buckley. Passed. Ayes, 53; Nays, 5--Conger, Gallegos, Hicks, Parrish, Unger; Excused, 2--Bailey, Weidner. |
2013-07-01 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-06-26 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-06-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed. Ayes, 22; nays, 8--Baertschiger, Edwards, Ferrioli, George, Knopp, Olsen, Starr, Thomsen. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Made a Special Order of Business by unanimous consent. |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Taken from 06-21 Calendar and placed on 06-26 Calendar on voice vote. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Taken from 06-18 Calendar and placed on 06-21 Calendar on voice vote. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Motion to reconsider carried on voice vote. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Edwards, Ferrioli served notice of possible reconsideration. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Bill failed. Ayes, 15; nays, 15--Baertschiger, Boquist, Close, Edwards, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Starr, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Motion to refer to Rules Failed. Ayes, 14; nays, 16--Bates, Beyer, Burdick, Devlin, Dingfelder, Edwards, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Prozanski, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward, President Courtney. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Motion to re-refer to Ways and Means Failed. Ayes, 14; nays, 15--Beyer, Burdick, Devlin, Dingfelder, Edwards, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Prozanski, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward, President Courtney; excused, 1--Bates. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Taken from 06-11 Calendar and placed on 06-17 Calendar on voice vote. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |