OR SB5518 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Effective date, July 27, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Effective date, July 27, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Legislative Administration Committee, Legislative Assembly, Legislative Counsel Committee, Legislative Fiscal Officer, Legislative Revenue Officer and Commission on Indian Services for biennial expenses. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by certain legislative branch agencies. Authorizes specified nonlimited expenditures. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2015.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of legislative branch agencies; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-07-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-28 | Senate | Effective date, July 27, 2015. |
2015-07-28 | Senate | Chapter 772, 2015 Laws. |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-07-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 4--Hayden, Nearman, Parrish, Weidner. |
2015-07-01 | House | Second reading. |
2015-07-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-06-30 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-06-30 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 2--Knopp, Thatcher; excused, 2--Olsen, Shields. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Public Hearing Cancelled. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |