OR SB5518 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-24 - Effective date, July 19, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-24 - Effective date, July 19, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Education for certain biennial expenses.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Department of Education; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-24 | Senate | Effective date, July 19, 2013. |
2013-07-24 | Senate | Chapter 637, 2013 Laws. |
2013-07-22 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-07-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-28 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Sprenger. Passed. Ayes, 53; Nays, 6--Freeman, Gilliam, Hicks, Thatcher, Weidner, Whitsett; Excused for Business of the House, 1--McLane. |
2013-06-28 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-06-26 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-06-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Devlin, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote aye. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed. Ayes, 24; nays, 5--Ferrioli, George, Knopp, Kruse, Whitsett; excused, 1--Boquist. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |