OR SB5517 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Approves certain new or increased fees adopted by Department of Environmental Quality. Approves certain new or increased fees adopted by Department of Environmental Quality. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Department of Environmental Quality; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective date, July 19, 2021. |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Chapter 604, 2021 Laws. |
2021-07-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-25 | House | Third reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed. Ayes, 34; Nays, 21--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Evans, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 4--Dexter, Hayden, Smith G, Wilde. |
2021-06-24 | House | Rules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to June 25, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-24 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2021-06-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-21 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 16; Nays, 11--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Johnson, Kennemer, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |