OR SB5516 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, July 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, July 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Bureau of Labor and Industries for biennial expenses. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by bureau. Limits biennial expenditures by bureau from Wage Security Fund. Authorizes specified nonlimited expenditures. Limits biennial expenditures by bureau from federal funds. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Bureau of Labor and Industries; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-08 | Senate | Effective date, July 23, 2019. |
2019-08-08 | Senate | Chapter 633, 2019 Laws. |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-07-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-29 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Post. Passed. Ayes, 52; Excused, 7--Clem, Greenlick, Hernandez, McKeown, Noble, Smith DB, Wallan. |
2019-06-29 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2019-06-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-06-29 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-29 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Golden. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 27; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Public Hearing Cancelled. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |