OR SB5515 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Effective date, August 9, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Effective date, August 9, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Justice for biennial expenses. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by department. Limits biennial expenditures by department from federal funds. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Department of Justice; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-14 | Senate | Effective date, August 9, 2019. |
2019-08-14 | Senate | Chapter 692, 2019 Laws. |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-07-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-29 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Piluso. Passed. Ayes, 46; Nays, 5--Evans, Gorsek, Nearman, Reschke, Williamson; Excused, 7--Clem, Greenlick, Hernandez, McKeown, Noble, Smith DB, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Wilson. |
2019-06-29 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2019-06-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-06-29 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-29 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Manning Jr. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Knopp declared potential conflict of interest. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 27; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |