OR SB5512 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date, July 1, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date, July 1, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limits certain biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by Department of Consumer and Business Services. Limits biennial expenditures by department from federal funds. Limits biennial expenditures by department from Health Insurance Exchange Fund. Limits biennial expenditures from COFA Premium Assistance Program Fund. Authorizes specified unlimited expenditures. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Department of Consumer and Business Services; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Senate - Senate (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Senate - Senate (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Effective date, July 1, 2017. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Chapter 372, 2017 Laws. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed.Ayes, 37; Nays, 20--Barreto, Bentz, Esquivel, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Vial, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 3--Boone, Lininger, Piluso. |
2017-05-31 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 1, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 31, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 30, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-25 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-18 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-05-18 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed.Ayes, 21; nays, 9--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Kruse, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |