OR SB5509 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, July 1, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, July 1, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by Construction Contractors Board. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by Construction Contractors Board. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Construction Contractors Board; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Effective date, July 1, 2021. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Chapter 347, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Boshart Davis, Clem, Owens, Wright. |
2021-06-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-01 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-27 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-05-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Lieber. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 3--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Thatcher. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |