OR SB5506 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-08 - Effective date, July 29, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-08 - Effective date, July 29, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes amounts authorized for issuance of general obligation bonds, revenue bonds, certificates of participation and other financing agreements for biennium.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-08 | Senate | Effective date, July 29, 2013. |
2013-08-08 | Senate | Chapter 705, 2013 Laws. |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-07-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-08 | House | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Smith. |
2013-07-08 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Smith. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 7--Esquivel, Hicks, McLane, Richardson, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner; Excused, 2--Boone, Keny-Guyer. |
2013-07-08 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2013-07-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-07-08 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-07-08 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 25; nays, 3--Boquist, Ferrioli, George; excused, 2--Dingfelder, Starr. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-07-07 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-07-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-07-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |