OR SB5505 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-01 - Effective date, July 18, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Oregon Criminal Justice Commission for biennial expenses. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Oregon Criminal Justice Commission for biennial expenses. Limits biennial expenditures by commission from certain lottery moneys. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by commission. Limits biennial expenditures by commission from federal funds. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the financial administration of the Oregon Criminal Justice Commission; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2023-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-01SenateEffective date, July 18, 2023.
2023-08-01SenateChapter 378, 2023 Laws.
2023-07-18SenateGovernor signed.
2023-06-25HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-06-24SenatePresident signed.
2023-06-22HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nguyen D. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 1--Cate; Excused, 8--Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Diehl, Elmer, Morgan, Nguyen H, Reschke, Wright.
2023-06-22HouseSecond reading.
2023-06-22HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-06-20HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2023-06-20HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2023-06-16SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Knopp.
2023-06-16SenateThird reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 23; Absent, 6--Bonham, Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Woods.
2023-06-15SenateSecond reading.
2023-05-30SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2023-05-26SenateWork Session held.
2023-05-17SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2023-05-17SenateWork Session held.
2023-02-14SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-02-13SenateInformational Meeting held.
2023-02-02SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
2023-02-02SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2023-02-02SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/SB5505
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB5505/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB5505/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB5505/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB5505/Enrolled
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24984
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25124
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/73754
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/260906
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/261291
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/273959
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/274843
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/274878
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80039
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80053
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80079
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80948
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35940
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=586814
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=588999

Bill Comments

feedback