OR SB5502 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Effective date, July 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Effective date, July 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Oregon Department of Administrative Services for certain biennial expenses. Limits certain biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts and certain federal funds, but excluding lottery funds and other federal funds, collected or received by department. Limits biennial expenditures by department from certain lottery moneys. Authorizes specified nonlimited expenditures. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Oregon Department of Administrative Services; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Effective date, July 1, 2019. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Chapter 518, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-18 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith G. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 4--Nearman, Post, Reschke, Wallan. |
2019-06-17 | House | Carried over to June 18, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-06-13 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-06-11 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Wagner. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 5--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Linthicum, Olsen, Thomsen. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Work Session cancelled. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Work Session cancelled. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |