OR SB547 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires public body that declares riot or civil disturbance to pay peace officers double regular pay for responding to riot or civil disturbance. Requires public body that declares riot or civil disturbance to pay peace officers double regular pay for responding to riot or civil disturbance.
Title
Relating to compensation of peace officers.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Girod [R] | Sen. Lynn Findley [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Withdraw from Committee (Y: 10 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Motion to withdraw from committee on Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation failed. Ayes, 10; Nays, 19--Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Frederick, Gelser, Golden, Heard, Jama, Johnson, Lieber, Manning Jr, Patterson, President Courtney, Prozanski, Riley, Robinson, Steiner Hayward, Taylor, Wagner; Excused, 1--Gorsek. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |