OR SB543 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 5 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Vote explanation(s) filed by Piluso, Sollman.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes formation of children's service districts. Authorizes children's service districts to levy property taxes to fund programs that offer children's services. Defines "children's services" as services that support children's total health and well-being provided outside of school hours to individuals not more than 18 years of age. Provides that, if action is filed claiming] asserting valid claim that revenue funding project is subject to compression under $5 per $1,000 of real market value cap for purposes of Ballot Measure 5 (1990) as revenue funding project constituting educational services, children's service district shall discontinue project and shall use revenue for project that does not constitute educational services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to children's service districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-05-22 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Piluso, Sollman.
2019-06-05HouseThird reading. Carried by Schouten. Failed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 38--Barker, Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Bynum, Clem, Doherty, Drazan, Evans, Fahey, Findley, Gomberg, Gorsek, Hayden, Hernandez, Holvey, Lewis, Lively, McKeown, McLane, Nathanson, Nearman, Neron, Noble, Piluso, Post, Reardon, Reschke, Smith Warner, Sollman, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Williams, Wilson, Witt, Zika; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Rayfield.
2019-06-04HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 5, 2019 Calendar.
2019-06-03HouseSecond reading.
2019-05-30HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2019-05-22HouseWork Session held.
2019-05-15HouseWork Session held.
2019-04-24HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-25HouseReferred to Human Services and Housing.
2019-03-18HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-03-14SenateThird reading. Carried by Riley. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 9--Baertschiger Jr, Girod, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Monnes Anderson, Olsen, Steiner Hayward, Thomsen.
2019-03-12SenateTaken from 03-12 Calendar and placed on 03-14 Calendar on voice vote.
2019-03-11SenateSecond reading.
2019-03-11SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2019-03-05SenateWork Session held.
2019-02-14SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-01-16SenateReferred to Finance and Revenue.
2019-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback