OR SB542 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Work Session held.
Pending: Senate Energy and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Task Force on Vehicle Charging Stations. Establishes Task Force on Vehicle Charging Stations. Directs task force to investigate installing vehicle charging stations across Oregon on public property and make recommendations for any changes necessary in state statutes that can promote installation and use of vehicle charging stations. Sunsets December 31, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Task Force on Vehicle Charging Stations; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25SenateWork Session held.
2021-02-02SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Energy and Environment.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback