OR SB542 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits Secretary of State to examine uncompiled source code for computer program or computer software used in voting machine or vote tally system as part of audit of machine or system. Requires auditor to report results of examination only to Secretary of State, State Chief Information Officer and Legislative Fiscal Officer. Directs Secretary of State to require vendor of voting machine or vote tally system to correct deficiencies that auditor finds during audit and to reject or revoke approval of voting machine or vote tally system if vendor refuses or is unable to correct deficiencies. Requires contract for purchase or procurement of voting machine or vote tally system to permit Secretary of State's audit.
Title
Relating to audits of vote recording systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Cancelled. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB542 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB542/Introduced |