OR SB539 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Oregon Health Authority to conduct study and develop recommendations for classification system for traumatic brain injuries and training for first responders and law enforcement in identifying symptoms of traumatic brain injuries, acquired brain injuries and post-traumatic stress syndrome and training on appropriate referrals for services and treatment. Requires Oregon Health Authority to conduct study and develop recommendations for classification system for traumatic brain injuries and training for first responders and law enforcement in identifying symptoms of traumatic brain injuries, acquired brain injuries and post-traumatic stress syndrome and training on appropriate referrals for services and treatment. Sunsets January 2, 2025.
Title
Relating to trauma-induced injuries.
Sponsors
Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] | Sen. Wlnsvey Campos [D] | Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] | Sen. James Manning [D] |
Rep. Susan McLain [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |