OR SB536 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes best interest standard for recommendations or sales of annuities to prospective purchasers. Establishes best interest standard for recommendations or sales of annuities to prospective purchasers. Specifies contents of and requirements for compliance with standard. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to annuities; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-14SenateEffective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
2023-06-14SenateChapter 143, 2023 Laws.
2023-06-01SenateGovernor signed.
2023-05-25HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-05-24SenatePresident signed.
2023-05-22HouseThird reading. Carried by Javadi. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 5--Cate, Evans, Hieb, Morgan, Reschke; Excused, 3--Boshart Davis, Ruiz, Sosa.
2023-05-18HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-17HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-16HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 17, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-15HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 16, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-11HouseSecond reading.
2023-05-10HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-05-09HouseWork Session held.
2023-04-25HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-04-13HouseReferred to Economic Development and Small Business.
2023-04-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2023-04-11SenateThird reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 3--Bonham, Boquist, Robinson; Excused, 1--Gorsek.
2023-04-10SenateCarried over to 04-11 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-06SenateCarried over to 04-10 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-05SenateCarried over to 04-06 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-04SenateCarried over to 04-05 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-03SenateSecond reading.
2023-03-31SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2023-03-22SenateWork Session held.
2023-01-25SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-13SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2023-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/SB536
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB536/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB536/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB536/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB536/Enrolled
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23240
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23538
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76296
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77287
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/66490
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76363
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77082
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/259283
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/259172
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/266111
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/266112
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/266100
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271501
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271731
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/273017
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/273123
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/273124
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79189
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34757
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=572376
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35605
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=580995

Bill Comments

feedback