OR SB536 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to State Department of Agriculture for distribution to Food Innovation Center of Oregon State University to support product development relating to milk. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to funding for milk product development; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources, then Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |