OR SB535 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates refundable income tax credit for certain child care workers. Creates refundable income tax credit for certain child care workers. Provides for child care worker to elect to deposit refund attributable to credit in Oregon Retirement Savings Plan. Provides for credit to be claimed on personal income tax return for 2024 tax year. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to tax credits for child care workers; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Tax Expenditures by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Tax Expenditures by prior reference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Tax Expenditures by prior reference. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business, then Tax Expenditures. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |