OR SB535 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Referred to Human Services.
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies child abuse reporting requirements to add hotelkeepers and innkeepers as mandatory reporters of child abuse. Modifies child abuse reporting requirements to add hotelkeepers and innkeepers as mandatory reporters of child abuse. Modifies requirement for processor of photographic images or computer technician to report visual recording of child involved in sexually explicit conduct. Punishes failure to report by maximum of 364 days' imprisonment, $6,250 fine, or both.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to mandatory reporting of child abuse.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12HouseReferred to Human Services.
2021-04-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-05SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-04-05SenateThird reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 2--Boquist, Heard; Excused, 2--Gelser, Thomsen.
2021-04-01SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-01SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-03-23SenateWork Session held.
2021-02-25SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback