OR SB534 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Oregon Facilities Authority to provide financing for infrastructure and predevelopment costs for moderate income housing. Requires Oregon Facilities Authority to provide financing for infrastructure and predevelopment costs for moderate income housing. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to the authority for such purposes. Sunsets January 2, 2026. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to predevelopment costs for moderate income housing; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-02-01SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-14SenateReferred to Housing and Development, then Ways and Means.
2023-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback