OR SB531 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Director of Office of Emergency Management to appoint advisory committee to consult with representatives of rural communities and rural fire protection districts. Requires advisory committee to encourage community and district representatives to identify and develop strategies to expand or enhance capability of districts to assist community development following natural disaster. Requires advisory committee to encourage community and district representatives to identify existing and needed resources to enhance or expand capability of districts to assist community development following natural disaster. Requires advisory committee to gather and evaluate information from community and district representatives regarding potential state government actions to assist communities and districts to expand or enhance capability of districts to assist community development following natural disaster. Requires advisory committee to provide report to interim legislative committee no later than September 15, 2018. Sunsets December 31, 2018. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to community development; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments, subsequent referral to General Government and Accountability be rescinded and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) subsequent referral to Committee on General Government and Accountability be rescinded and be referred to Committee on Ways and Means by Prior Reference. Subsequent referral to General Government and Accountability recinded by order of the President. Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness, then General Government and Accountability, then Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |