OR SB53 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies licensing fees paid to Oregon Health Authority by in-home care agencies and hospice providers.
Title
Relating to licensing fees paid to the Oregon Health Authority.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-19 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2018. |
2017-07-19 | Senate | Chapter 559, 2017 Laws. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-26 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hayden. Passed.Ayes, 55; Excused, 2--Boone, Sprenger; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Bentz, McKeown, Speaker Kotek. |
2017-06-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 26, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-22 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-06-21 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-06-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 24; nays, 3--Linthicum, Olsen, Thomsen; excused, 3--Knopp, Thatcher, Winters. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Human Services. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |