OR SB520 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-19 - Referred to Legislative Audits.
Pending: Joint Legislative Audits Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Secretary of State to audit Employment Department to determine whether department processes claims for unemployment insurance benefits promptly as required under ORS chapter 657 and to submit report of audit findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to business on or before September 15, 2022. Directs Secretary of State to audit Employment Department to determine whether department processes claims for unemployment insurance benefits promptly as required under ORS chapter 657 and to submit report of audit findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to business on or before September 15, 2022. Sunsets January 2, 2023. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to unemployment insurance benefits; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Legislative Audits.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback