OR SB517 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits licensing board, commission or agency from denying, suspending or revoking occupational or professional license solely for reason that applicant or licensee was convicted of crime or subject to qualifying juvenile adjudication that does not substantially relate to specific duties and responsibilities for which license is required. Prohibits licensing board, commission or agency from denying, suspending or revoking occupational or professional license solely for reason that applicant or licensee was convicted of crime or subject to qualifying juvenile adjudication that does not substantially relate to specific duties and responsibilities for which license is required. Specifies criteria for determining whether crime substantially relates to specific duties and responsibilities for which license is required. Specifies additional restrictions on licensing board's, commission's or agency's power to deny occupational or professional license. Permits person convicted of crime to petition licensing board, commission or agency at any time for determination as to whether conviction will prevent person from receiving occupational or professional license. Permits licensing board, commission or agency to charge reasonable fee for determination. Provides that final] determination is binding upon licensing board, commission or agency unless, at time of petition, person has charges pending, failed to disclose previous crime or was convicted of crime after submitting petition. Requires notice to person before final] determination that conviction will result in denial of occupational or professional license. Specifies additional rights of person and additional notice requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the effects on adjudicated persons of adjudications for criminal acts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-05-01SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2023-05-01SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2023-04-04SenateWork Session held.
2023-03-28SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-02-23SenatePublic Hearing Cancelled.
2023-01-11SenateReferred to Education.
2023-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/SB517
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB517/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB517/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB517/A-Engrossed
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23464
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24346
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/73493
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/266921
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268816
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268815
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/269569
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77675
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77689
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78220
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78882
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35195

Bill Comments

feedback