OR SB513 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires students to complete at least one-half credit of civics in order to receive high school diploma. Requires student to demonstrate proficiency in civics in order to receive high school diploma.] Takes effect January 1, 2025.] Requires students to complete at least one-half credit of civics in order to receive high school diploma. Applies to high school diplomas awarded on or after January 1, 2026.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to civics education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10SenateEffective date, January 1, 2022.
2021-06-10SenateChapter 175, 2021 Laws.
2021-06-03SenateGovernor signed.
2021-05-27HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-05-26SenatePresident signed.
2021-05-24HouseThird reading. Carried by Evans. Passed. Ayes, 60.
2021-05-20HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-19HouseCarried over to May 20, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-05-18HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-17HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-13HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-13HouseInformational Meeting held.
2021-04-22HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-12HouseReferred to Education.
2021-04-07HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-07SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-04-07SenateThird reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 3--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum; Excused, 2--Johnson, Thatcher.
2021-04-05SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-01SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2021-03-24SenateWork Session held.
2021-03-10SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Education.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB513
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB513/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB513/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB513/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB513/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31555
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=513416
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32414
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=524518

Bill Comments

feedback