OR SB510 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Public Records Advocate to estimate biennial costs to carry out duties of advocate and to allocate and assess costs among public bodies of state government. Directs Public Records Advocate to estimate biennial costs to carry out duties of advocate and to allocate and assess costs among public bodies of state government. Directs advocate to adopt rules establishing methods for allocating and collecting assessments. Credits assessments to Public Records Advocate Fund. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Public Records Advocate; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-14SenateEffective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
2023-06-14SenateChapter 155, 2023 Laws.
2023-06-06SenateGovernor signed.
2023-05-25HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-05-25SenatePresident signed.
2023-05-23HouseThird reading. Carried by Bynum. Passed. Ayes, 45; Excused, 1--Evans; Excused for Business of the House, 14--Boshart Davis, Conrad, Cramer, Elmer, Helfrich, Javadi, Morgan, Nathanson, Nguyen D, Owens, Ruiz, Sanchez, Wallan, Speaker Rayfield.
2023-05-22HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-18HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-17HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-16HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 17, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-15HouseSecond reading.
2023-05-12HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-05-01HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2023-05-01HouseWithout recommendation as to passage and be referred to Ways and Means.
2023-04-27HouseWork Session held.
2023-04-20HouseReferred to Emergency Management, General Government, and Veterans.
2023-04-18HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2023-04-17SenateThird reading. Carried by Thatcher. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Findley, Gorsek.
2023-04-13SenateCarried over to 04-17 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-12SenateSecond reading.
2023-04-12SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-04-07SenateWork Session held.
2023-03-28SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2023-03-28SenateWork Session held.
2023-03-24SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On General Government.
2023-02-27SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2023-02-27SenateRecommendation: Do Pass and be referred to Ways and Means.
2023-02-21SenateWork Session held.
2023-02-07SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-14SenateReferred to Rules.
2023-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/SB510
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB510/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB510/Enrolled
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/74295
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/66466
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/74227
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/74319
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/260692
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/260160
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/262050
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/261737
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/262087
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267407
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/270144
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/270145
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78392
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271414
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271609
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78852
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79365
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34348
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35276
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=573982
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35462
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=581409

Bill Comments

feedback