OR SB51 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on June 3 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Speaker signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Removes designation of Department of Education as education provider of certain programs for purposes of provisions related to reports of suspected abuse or suspected sexual conduct. Removes designation of Department of Education as education provider of certain programs for purposes of provisions related to reports of suspected abuse or suspected sexual conduct. Modifies investigatory procedures for department upon receipt of reports of suspected sexual conduct. Expands eligibility of persons who can be designated as licensed administrator for purposes of receiving and responding to reports of suspected abuse or suspected sexual conduct. Allows department to share information received by department related to reports of abuse in certain circumstances and under certain restrictions. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to interpersonal boundary invasions affecting youth; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-09SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-08SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-06-08SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 29; Nays, 1--Heard.
2021-06-03HouseThird reading. Carried by Williams. Passed. Ayes, 49; Excused, 6--Alonso Leon, Boshart Davis, Clem, Owens, Smith DB, Wright; Excused for Business of the House, 5--Drazan, Holvey, Rayfield, Sanchez, Speaker Kotek.
2021-06-02HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-01HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-27HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2021-05-24HouseWork Session held.
2021-04-28HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-12HouseReferred to Human Services.
2021-04-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-08SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-04-08SenateThird reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 1--Thatcher.
2021-04-07SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-05SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2021-03-25SenateWork Session held.
2021-02-11SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB51
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB51/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB51/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB51/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB51/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB51/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB51/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31580
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=513905
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32634
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=527348
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=528378

Bill Comments 750

feedback