OR SB51 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, June 23, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, June 23, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Removes designation of Department of Education as education provider of certain programs for purposes of provisions related to reports of suspected abuse or suspected sexual conduct. Removes designation of Department of Education as education provider of certain programs for purposes of provisions related to reports of suspected abuse or suspected sexual conduct. Modifies investigatory procedures for department upon receipt of reports of suspected sexual conduct. Expands eligibility of persons who can be designated as licensed administrator for purposes of receiving and responding to reports of suspected abuse or suspected sexual conduct. Allows department to share information received by department related to reports of abuse in certain circumstances and under certain restrictions. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to interpersonal boundary invasions affecting youth; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Senate | Effective date, June 23, 2021. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Chapter 386, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 29; Nays, 1--Heard. |
2021-06-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williams. Passed. Ayes, 49; Excused, 6--Alonso Leon, Boshart Davis, Clem, Owens, Smith DB, Wright; Excused for Business of the House, 5--Drazan, Holvey, Rayfield, Sanchez, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-01 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2021-05-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-12 | House | Referred to Human Services. |
2021-04-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 1--Thatcher. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |