OR SB508 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that images of dead bodies that are part of law enforcement agency investigation are exempt from disclosure as public record if disclosure would create unreasonable invasion of privacy of family of deceased person. Creates exception if public interest requires disclosure in particular instance.
Title
Relating to images of death.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Chapter 340, 2017 Laws. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Boone, Lininger, Piluso. |
2017-05-31 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 1, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 31, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 30, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-24 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-17 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-05-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Winters. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |