OR SB505 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-10 - Effective date, August 2, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-10 - Effective date, August 2, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs district attorney to ensure proceedings before grand jury are recorded using audio electronic recording devices designated, provided and maintained by Judicial Department. Directs district attorney to ensure proceedings before grand jury are recorded using audio electronic recording devices designated, provided and maintained by Judicial Department. Directs district attorney to delegate recording requirement to grand juror and to provide instruction regarding audio electronic recording equipment. Authorizes court to appoint, at request of prosecuting attorney, shorthand reporter to record grand jury proceedings at prosecuting attorney's expense. Provides for phase-in of recording process based on population of district. Requires district attorney to maintain audio recordings or shorthand reporter report. Specifies matters that must be recorded and matters that may not be recorded. Provides that audio recordings and shorthand reporter notes or report are confidential. Creates procedures for release of audio recordings or shorthand reporter notes or report. Specifies procedures for release of transcript of grand jury proceeding concerning public servant resulting in indictment indorsed "not a true bill." Provides process for prosecuting attorney to request and enter protective order prohibiting or restricting access to recordings, shorthand reporter notes or report or transcript. Authorizes prosecuting attorney to file motion for protective order on behalf of victim or witness and requires prosecuting attorney to describe specific portion of recording, shorthand reporter notes or report or transcript to be redacted. Specifies when recording, shorthand reporter notes or report or transcript prepared from recording may be used in court proceedings. Allows statements of certain persons to be received through testimony of peace officer. Directs Public Defense Services Commission, Judicial Department and counties beginning recordation on March 1, 2018, to provide preliminary report on implementation of Act to Emergency Board and interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to judiciary no later than December 1, 2018, and final report to Joint Committee on Ways and Means and committees of Legislative Assembly related to judiciary no later than February 1, 2019. Appropriates moneys to Judicial Department for purchase of recording equipment and services and other expenses necessary to carry out provisions of Act. Appropriates moneys to Emergency Board to be allocated for expenses necessary to carry out provisions of Act. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to recording of grand jury proceedings; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-07-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-10 | Senate | Effective date, August 2, 2017. |
2017-08-10 | Senate | Chapter 650, 2017 Laws. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-07 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed.Ayes, 34; Nays, 26--Barker, Barreto, Bentz, Boone, Buehler, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Lewis, Lively, McKeown, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reardon, Reschke, Smith G, Sprenger, Vial, Witt. |
2017-07-06 | House | Rules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to July 7, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-07-06 | House | Second reading. |
2017-07-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-07-05 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-07-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Monnes Anderson. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 21; nays, 7--Girod, Hansell, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Thatcher, Thomsen; excused, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Olsen. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2017-07-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary, then Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |