OR SB500 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - Governor signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Public Records Advocate as independent office within executive department. Establishes Public Records Advocate as independent office within executive department. Requires Public Records Advocate to select and appoint Deputy Public Records Advocate and authorizes advocate to delegate authority, power or duty to act to deputy. Authorizes Public Records Advisory Council to appoint advocate. Authorizes council to support or oppose legislation relating to public records law and to request legislators to introduce legislation relating to public records law. Establishes Public Records Advocate Fund in State Treasury. Continuously appropriates moneys in fund for purpose of funding operations of office of Public Records Advocate and Public Records Advisory Council. Ratifies and affirms actions taken by council before effective date of Act to recruit and appoint advocate. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Public Records Advisory Council; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-19SenateGovernor signed.
2021-06-26HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-26SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-23HouseThird reading. Carried by Power. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 2--Bonham, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Reardon.
2021-06-22HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 23, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-21HouseSecond reading.
2021-06-18HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-06-16HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2021-06-16HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-06-16SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-06-16SenateThird reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 1--Manning Jr.
2021-06-15SenateSecond reading.
2021-06-15SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2021-06-11SenateWork Session held.
2021-06-10SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2021-06-10SenateWork Session held.
2021-06-05SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On General Government.
2021-03-05SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2021-03-05SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
2021-03-02SenateWork Session held.
2021-02-11SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Labor and Business.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB500
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB500/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB500/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB500/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB500/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31160
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32917
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=531189
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=533088

Bill Comments 750

feedback