OR SB5 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies laws related to student athlete agents.
Title
Relating to student athlete agents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2018. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Chapter 113, 2017 Laws. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-05-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-09 | House | Third reading. Carried by Post. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Gorsek, McLane. |
2017-05-08 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 9, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-04 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 8, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 4, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 3, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-01 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-04-25 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by President Courtney. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Dembrow. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Carried over to 02-23 by unanimous consent. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |