OR SB498 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-21 - Effective date, September 24, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-21 - Effective date, September 24, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows exclusion from taxable estate for value of interest in farm, forestry or fishing business. Allows exclusion from taxable estate for value of interest in farm, forestry or fishing business. Applies to estates of decedents dying on or after July 1, 2023. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to estate tax treatment of natural resource property; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Hansell [R] | Sen. Lynn Findley [R] | Sen. David Smith [R] | Rep. Bobby Levy [R] |
Rep. Kevin Mannix [R] | Sen. Fred Girod [R] | Sen. Cedric Hayden [R] | Sen. Mark Meek [D] |
Sen. Suzanne Weber [R] | Rep. Shelly Boshart Davis [R] | Rep. Jami Cate [R] | Rep. Tracy Cramer [R] |
Rep. Ed Diehl [R] | Rep. James Hieb [R] | Rep. Werner Reschke [R] | Rep. Gregory Smith [R] |
Rep. Boomer Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-21 | Senate | Effective date, September 24, 2023. |
2023-07-21 | Senate | Chapter 286, 2023 Laws. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-06-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-23 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Andersen, Nathanson. |
2023-06-23 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Levy B, Mannix. Passed. Ayes, 35; Nays, 20--Andersen, Bowman, Chaichi, Dexter, Fahey, Gamba, Grayber, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Marsh, Nathanson, Nelson, Neron, Nosse, Pham K, Reynolds, Sanchez, Sosa, Valderrama; Excused, 5--Elmer, Morgan, Nguyen H, Reschke, Wright. |
2023-06-23 | House | Second reading. |
2023-06-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-06-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-06-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-06-20 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2023-06-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Anderson, Steiner. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 16; Nays, 9--Campos, Dembrow, Frederick, Golden, Manning Jr, Patterson, Prozanski, Sollman, Taylor; Absent, 5--Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Carried over to 06-20 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Informational Meeting held. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |