OR SB496 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, July 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, July 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits school district from restricting access by alternative education students, English language learners or special education students to specialized learning areas and certain common areas. Requires school districts to ensure that all students of school district have equal access to educational facilities. Prohibits certain requirements or restrictions from being imposed on] Prohibits school district from restricting access by alternative education students, English language learners or special education students to specialized learning areas and certain common areas. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to access to educational facilities; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Effective date, July 1, 2019. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Chapter 334, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Alonso Leon. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Barker, Boles, Clem; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Evans. |
2019-05-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-05-29 | House | Carried over to May 30, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-28 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to Education. |
2019-04-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--President Courtney. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |