OR SB495 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates exception to safety belt laws that allows person to not use safety belt if all seating positions in vehicle are occupied.
Title
Relating to exceptions to safety belt requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Bates [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Motion to rerefer to Business and Transportation carried by voice vote. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Carried over to 04-29 by unanimous consent. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |