OR SB494 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Advance Directive Adoption Committee for purpose of adopting form of advance directive to be used in this state. Specifies that form may not take effect unless form is ratified according to constitutional requirements for passage of legislative measures. Requires Advance Directive Adoption Committee to submit form of advance directive to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to judiciary. Directs interim committee, upon receiving form, to file proposed legislative measure with Legislative Counsel. Repeals statute setting forth current form of advance directive used in this state. Sets forth alternative form of advance directive that may be used in this state. Sunsets alternative form on January 1, 2020. Modifies means by which advance directive is executed. Modifies law by which individual is selected to make health care decisions for another individual who becomes incapable of making health care decisions. Makes certain other changes to provisions governing individuals who become incapable of making health care decisions. Becomes operative January 1, 2018. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to health care decisions; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-06-16 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-06-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Monnes Anderson. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 17; nays, 13--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, DeBoer, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Winters. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Minority Recommendation: Do pass with different amendments. (Printed A-Eng. Minority) |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary, then Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |