OR SB489 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Effective date, January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Effective date, January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates restrictions on payment of unemployment insurance benefits to certain nonprofessional educational workers. Eliminates restrictions on payment of unemployment insurance benefits to certain nonprofessional educational workers.
Title
Relating to unemployment insurance benefits for nonprofessional educational workers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-14 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2024. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Chapter 180, 2023 Laws. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-06-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-05-25 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Diehl. |
2023-05-25 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hudson. Passed. Ayes, 33; Nays, 21--Boice, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Conrad, Cramer, Diehl, Elmer, Goodwin, Helfrich, Hieb, Levy B, Lewis, McIntire, Morgan, Osborne, Owens, Reschke, Smith G, Stout, Wallan, Wright; Excused, 6--Boshart Davis, Evans, Holvey, Javadi, Scharf, Sosa. |
2023-05-24 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-18 | House | Second reading. |
2023-05-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-05-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-05-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-04-20 | House | Referred to Education. |
2023-04-18 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Robinson. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser Blouin. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 10--Bonham, Girod, Hansell, Hayden, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Smith DB, Thatcher, Weber; Excused, 2--Findley, Gorsek. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |