OR SB483 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, June 15, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, June 15, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates rebuttable presumption that person violated prohibition against retaliation or discrimination against employee or prospective employee if person takes certain action against employee or prospective employee within 60 days after employee or prospective employee has engaged in certain protected activities. Creates rebuttable presumption that person violated prohibition against retaliation or discrimination against employee or prospective employee if person takes certain action against employee or prospective employee within 60 days after employee or prospective employee has engaged in certain protected activities. Provides that employee or prospective employee bears burden of proof when person takes certain action against employee or prospective employee more than 60 days after employee or prospective employee has engaged in protected activities. Applies to complaints and civil actions filed in which decision or judgment is entered on or after effective date of Act. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to presumption of violation of certain prohibitions against protected activities regarding workplace safety; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Effective date, June 15, 2021. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Chapter 336, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-07 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith Warner. Passed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 20--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 3--Grayber, Hayden, Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Drazan. |
2021-06-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-01 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-20 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2021-04-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 12--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Public Hearing Cancelled. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |