OR SB475 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permits school district to provide abbreviated school day program to foster youth student only if student's foster parent is provided opportunity to participate in decision and school district provides certain written information to foster parent. Directs Department of Human Services to conduct monthly, in-person visits with child or ward in substitute care that include updates on academic status and progress. Directs department to conduct exit interview with child or ward no later than 30 days after department removes child or ward from substitute care placement.] Directs department to ensure, with respect to school placement, that child or ward is not placed in more restrictive setting than child or ward was placed in at resident school district nor in self-contained classroom as opposed to all-inclusive placement.] Requires department to ensure that child or ward 16 years of age or older has opportunity to create facilitated person centered plan before leaving substitute care.] Permits school district to provide abbreviated school day program to foster youth student only if no appropriate alternative exists, student's case manager and foster parent are involved in decision and student's foster parent, case worker, education surrogate and Director of Human Services consent] student's foster parent is provided opportunity to participate in decision and school district provides certain written information to foster parent.
Title
Relating to the well-being of children in substitute care placements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Chapter 295, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-30 | House | Third reading. Carried by Stark. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 1--Williams; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Boles, Williamson. |
2019-05-29 | House | Carried over to May 30, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-28 | House | Carried over to May 29, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-27 | House | Carried over to May 28, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-23 | House | Carried over to May 27, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-22 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2019-04-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--President Courtney. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Work Session cancelled. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Human Services. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |