OR SB47 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires person operating nonmotorized boat to have waterway access permit. Eliminates requirement that person operating nonmotorized boat have aquatic invasive species permit. Directs uses of waterway access permit fees. Directs State Marine Board to collaborate with certain groups for purpose of educating nonmotorized boat users about requirement to obtain waterway access permit. Directs board to report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to natural resources. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to small watercraft; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to resolve conflicts. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to resolve conflicts. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | Senate | Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Chapter 507, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 17; Nays, 11--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 24--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Evans, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Witt, Zika. |
2019-06-06 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2019-05-31 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-20 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-05-17 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 7--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Knopp, Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Work Session cancelled. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |