OR SB465 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that property of company that is organized and located outside of this state and exclusively operates jet boat excursion business on boundary rivers of this state and not on rivers within this state is not subject to central assessment for purposes of property taxation. Provides that property of company that is organized and located outside of this state and exclusively operates jet boat excursion business on boundary rivers of this state and not on rivers within this state is not subject to central assessment for purposes of property taxation. Provides that any property of such company located in this state on assessment date for property tax year is subject to local assessment for purposes of property taxation. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the taxation of the property of jet boat companies; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Hansell [R] | Rep. Bobby Levy [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-06-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-06-20 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2023-06-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Findley. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 25; Absent, 5--Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Carried over to 06-20 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Work Session cancelled. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Cancelled. |
2023-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |