OR SB462 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that person who served in United States Naval Construction Force, or "Seabees," is eligible to receive veterans' recognition registration plate.
Title
Relating to the veterans' recognition registration plate program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-05-14 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2019-04-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Heard, Johnson, Olsen. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |